NY A05472 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the functions of the chief administrator of the courts; relates to reporting requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the functions of the chief administrator of the courts; relates to reporting requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 102 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-30Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.520
2019-05-30Assemblyreported
2019-05-21Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-05-09Assemblyprint number 5472a
2019-05-09Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2019-02-12Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S01830 (Same As) 2019-05-10 - PRINT NUMBER 1830B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05472&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05472&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05472
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05472&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05472A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05472&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05472&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05472&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback