NY A05477 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-19 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-19 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes approval of certain transportation contracts of the Dansville central school district which failed to comply with certain filing requirements.
Title
Authorizes approval of certain transportation contracts of the Dansville central school district which failed to comply with certain filing requirements.
Sponsors
Asm. Bill Nojay [R] | Asm. Michael Montesano [R] | Asm. Raymond Walter [R] | Asm. Gary Finch [R] |
Asm. David DiPietro [R] | Asm. Jose Rivera [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-19 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | held for consideration in education |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to education |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | referred to education |