NY A05480 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-09 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-09 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of economic development, job development authority, and urban development corporation to provide preferences to small businesses and entrepreneurs in the administration of their economic development assistance programs; requires annual reports thereon.
Title
Requires the department of economic development, job development authority, and urban development corporation to provide preferences to small businesses and entrepreneurs in the administration of their economic development assistance programs; requires annual reports thereon.
Sponsors
Asm. Robin Schimminger [D] | Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D] | Asm. Patricia Fahy [D] | Asm. John McDonald [D] |
Asm. Nick Perry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S02089 (Same As) 2016-01-21 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S06588 (Same As) 2016-06-06 - referred to ways and means
S06588 (Same As) 2016-06-06 - referred to ways and means