NY A05484 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-09 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-09 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the taxation of property owned by a cooperative corporation.
Title
Relates to the taxation of property owned by a cooperative corporation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-01-19 | Assembly | print number 5484a |
2016-01-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2015-03-03 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S00618 (Same As) 2016-01-15 - PRINT NUMBER 618A