NY A05485 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the assessment for the state fiscal year that begins on April 1, 2020, and state fiscal years that begin on and after April 1, 2021.
Title
Relates to the assessment for the state fiscal year that begins on April 1, 2020, and state fiscal years that begin on and after April 1, 2021.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |