NY A05487 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - signed chap.461
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the secretary of state to compile, make public and keep current certain information on persons subjected to section 73-a of the public officers law and who hold policy-making positions; further requires the secretary of state to post such information on the department of state website.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the secretary of state to compile, make public and keep current certain information on persons subjected to section 73-a of the public officers law and who hold policy-making positions; further requires the secretary of state to post such information on the department of state website.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21Senatesigned chap.461
2018-12-11Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-06SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-06Senate3RD READING CAL.1551
2018-06-06SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S3810
2018-03-20SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2018-03-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-03-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.389
2018-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2017-03-20SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2017-03-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-03-20Assemblypassed assembly
2017-03-09Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.124
2017-03-07Assemblyreported
2017-02-09Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S03810 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5487

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback