NY A05493 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-22 - print number 5493b
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-22 - print number 5493b
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Modifies the standard of evidence and certain other procedures when determining whether to revoke the community supervision of a person.
Title
Modifies the standard of evidence and certain other procedures when determining whether to revoke the community supervision of a person.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-22 | Assembly | print number 5493b |
2020-04-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to correction |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | print number 5493a |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to correction |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S01343 (Same As) 2020-04-17 - PRINT NUMBER 1343C