NY A05498 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-19 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-19 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals certain provisions of chapter 1 of the laws of 2013, amending the criminal procedure law and other laws relating to suspension and revocation of firearms licenses.
Title
Repeals certain provisions of chapter 1 of the laws of 2013, amending the criminal procedure law and other laws relating to suspension and revocation of firearms licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-19 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | held for consideration in codes |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | referred to codes |