NY A05498 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - held for consideration in local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes a constitutional amendment to divide the state into three autonomous regions; the New Amsterdam Region, the New York Region and the Montauk Region; provides regional governors and regional legislators; provides only for a state sales tax; divides various departments and agencies; provides for separate court systems and prison systems.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposes a constitutional amendment to divide the state into three autonomous regions; the New Amsterdam Region, the New York Region and the Montauk Region; provides regional governors and regional legislators; provides only for a state sales tax; divides various departments and agencies; provides for separate court systems and prison systems.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11Assemblyheld for consideration in local governments
2020-02-14Assemblyopinion referred to judiciary
2020-01-17Assemblyto attorney-general for opinion
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to local governments
2019-03-14Assemblyopinion referred to judiciary
2019-02-14Assemblyto attorney-general for opinion
2019-02-12Assemblyreferred to local governments

Same As/Similar To

S05416 (Same As) 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback