NY A05499 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-11 - print number 5499b
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-11 - print number 5499b
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the licensure of athletic trainers; adds athletic trainers to the list of persons and officials required to report cases of suspected child abuse or maltreatment.
Title
Relates to the licensure of athletic trainers; adds athletic trainers to the list of persons and officials required to report cases of suspected child abuse or maltreatment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-11 | Assembly | print number 5499b |
2020-05-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2019-07-08 | Assembly | print number 5499a |
2019-07-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S05127 (Same As) 2020-07-06 - PRINT NUMBER 5127A