NY A05502 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-28)
Status: Passed on December 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-12 - approval memo.14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-28)
Status: Passed on December 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-12 - approval memo.14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits health insurers from requiring the insured purchase prescribed drugs from a mail order pharmacy or pay a co-payment fee when such purchases are not made from a mail order pharmacy if a similar fee is not charged for drugs from a mail order pharmacy.
Title
Prohibits health insurers from requiring the insured purchase prescribed drugs from a mail order pharmacy or pay a co-payment fee when such purchases are not made from a mail order pharmacy if a similar fee is not charged for drugs from a mail order pharmacy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-12 | Senate | approval memo.14 |
2011-12-12 | Senate | signed chap.597 |
2011-11-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2011-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1383 |
2011-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3510B |
2011-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-05-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.462 |
2011-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2011-05-17 | Assembly | print number 5502b |
2011-05-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2011-04-25 | Assembly | print number 5502a |
2011-04-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2011-02-22 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S03510 (Same As) 2011-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5502B