NY A05502 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-7)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - substituted by s3852a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts "Shannon's law"; relates to requiring insurance companies to cover annual mammograms for breast cancer screening for covered persons aged thirty-five and older.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts "Shannon's law"; relates to requiring insurance companies to cover annual mammograms for breast cancer screening for covered persons aged thirty-five and older.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18Assemblysubstituted by s3852a
2019-06-13Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.268
2019-06-13Assemblyrules report cal.268
2019-06-13Assemblyreported
2019-06-11Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-05Assemblyprint number 5502a
2019-06-05Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2019-06-04Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-05-21Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-02-13Assemblyreferred to insurance

Same As/Similar To

S03852 (Same As) 2019-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.143

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05502&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05502&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05502
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05502&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05502A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05502&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05502&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05502&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05502&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC4

Bill Comments

feedback