NY A05505 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - signed chap.502
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - signed chap.502
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to identifying lands at risk from sea level rise or flooding as eligible sending districts.
Title
Relates to identifying lands at risk from sea level rise or flooding as eligible sending districts.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] | Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D] | Asm. Patrick Burke [D] | Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] |
Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | Senate | signed chap.502 |
2019-11-08 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1530 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6424A |
2019-03-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.87 |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-13 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S03712 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S06424 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - signed chap.502
S06424 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - signed chap.502