NY A05539 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.216
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for community service as one of the punishments for the violation of a local law in a municipality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for community service as one of the punishments for the violation of a local law in a municipality.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24Senatesigned chap.216
2018-08-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.1873
2018-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S8272A
2018-06-20SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-05-08Assemblyamended on third reading 5539b
2018-05-03Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.834
2018-05-01Assemblyreported
2018-04-17Assemblyprint number 5539a
2018-04-17Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2018-03-13Assemblyreported referred to codes
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to local governments
2017-02-10Assemblyreferred to local governments

Same As/Similar To

S08272 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5539B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05539&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05539&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05539
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05539&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05539A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05539&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05539B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05539&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05539&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A5539#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05539&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback