NY A05540 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a corporate franchise tax check-off and a personal income tax check-off for taxpayer gifts for diabetes research and education; establishes the diabetes research and education fund.
Title
Provides for a corporate franchise tax check-off and a personal income tax check-off for taxpayer gifts for diabetes research and education; establishes the diabetes research and education fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | amended on third reading 5540c |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.391 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.108 |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.108 |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | print number 5540b |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | print number 5540a |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2017-02-10 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S06512 (Same As) 2018-01-26 - PRINT NUMBER 6512A