NY A05543 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-14 - substituted by s2398b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes Congregation Beth-El Sephardic Center to retroactively apply for a real property tax exemption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes Congregation Beth-El Sephardic Center to retroactively apply for a real property tax exemption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-14Assemblysubstituted by s2398b
2017-06-13Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.219
2017-06-13Assemblyrules report cal.219
2017-06-13Assemblyreported
2017-06-08Assemblyreported referred to rules
2017-06-06Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2017-04-28Assemblyprint number 5543b
2017-04-28Assemblyamend and recommit to real property taxation
2017-03-31Assemblyprint number 5543a
2017-03-31Assemblyamend and recommit to real property taxation
2017-02-10Assemblyreferred to real property taxation

Same As/Similar To

S02398 (Same As) 2017-08-21 - SIGNED CHAP.231

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05543&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05543&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05543
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05543&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05543A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05543&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05543B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05543&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05543&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05543&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3

Bill Comments

feedback