NY A05546 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-14 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-14 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to appointments to the water board of the city of New York.
Title
Relates to appointments to the water board of the city of New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2017-02-10 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S02592 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES