NY A05547 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes counties to employ computer generated registration lists; updates the list of supplies to be delivered to poll sites.
Title
Authorizes counties to employ computer generated registration lists; updates the list of supplies to be delivered to poll sites.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.392 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-03-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.125 |
2017-03-08 | Assembly | reported |
2017-02-10 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S02788 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS