NY A05563 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - signed chap.170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates state route 394 in the village of Lakewood, county of Chautauqua, as the "Lance Corporal Aaron M. Swanson Memorial Highway".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates state route 394 in the village of Lakewood, county of Chautauqua, as the "Lance Corporal Aaron M. Swanson Memorial Highway".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-16Senatesigned chap.170
2019-08-12Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-06-18SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-18Senate3RD READING CAL.1652
2019-06-18SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6528
2019-05-30SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
2019-05-30Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-30Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-23Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.418
2019-05-21Assemblyreported
2019-05-07Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-02-13Assemblyreferred to transportation

Same As/Similar To

S00913 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S06528 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5563

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05563&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05563&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05563
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05563&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05563&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05563&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A5563#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback