NY A05566 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-03 - signed chap.276
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-03 - signed chap.276
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Ramapo to accept an application for real property tax exemption from the Rock Apostolic Church in the village of Spring Valley, town of Ramapo, county of Rockland.
Title
Authorizes the town of Ramapo to accept an application for real property tax exemption from the Rock Apostolic Church in the village of Spring Valley, town of Ramapo, county of Rockland.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 115 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 115 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-03 | Senate | signed chap.276 |
2011-07-22 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2011-06-13 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-13 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.885 |
2011-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4294 |
2011-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2011-06-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-05-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.464 |
2011-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2011-03-08 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-02-23 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S04294 (Same As) 2011-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5566