NY A05566 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-19 - advanced to third reading cal.663
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-19 - advanced to third reading cal.663
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to alternative hardship applications for properties subject to the rent stabilization code.
Title
Relates to alternative hardship applications for properties subject to the rent stabilization code.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Kavanagh [D] | Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Nick Perry [D] |
Asm. Herman Farrell [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.663 |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S01783 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT