NY A05567 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - print number 5567a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - print number 5567a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates state route 394 between the village of Falconer, the town of Poland, county of Chautauqua, and through the town of Randolph, county of Cattaraugus as the "Staff Sergeant David Textor Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates state route 394 between the village of Falconer, the town of Poland, county of Chautauqua, and through the town of Randolph, county of Cattaraugus as the "Staff Sergeant David Textor Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Assembly | print number 5567a |
2020-03-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-02-13 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S00911 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S06518 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S07282 (Same As) 2020-06-09 - referred to transportation
S06518 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S07282 (Same As) 2020-06-09 - referred to transportation