NY A05568 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes that portion of state route 5 on the Seaway Trail, within the Purple Heart Highway.
Title
Includes that portion of state route 5 on the Seaway Trail, within the Purple Heart Highway.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-02-13 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S00868 (Same As) 2019-01-09 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
S07221 (Same As) 2020-01-10 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
S07221 (Same As) 2020-01-10 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION