NY A05601 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-25 - print number 5601a
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-25 - print number 5601a
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows absentee voting for persons unable to vote due to duties, occupation, business, personal matters or studies; no agent may collect more than 15 ballots except with approval of two inspectors representing different political parties.
Title
Allows absentee voting for persons unable to vote due to duties, occupation, business, personal matters or studies; no agent may collect more than 15 ballots except with approval of two inspectors representing different political parties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-25 | Assembly | print number 5601a |
2016-04-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to election law |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S00873 (Same As) 2016-01-14 - PRINT NUMBER 873A