NY A05603 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that with the first opioid prescription of each year for use in a setting other than a general hospital or nursing home under article twenty-eight of this chapter or facility under article thirty-one of the mental hygiene law, or when a practitioner is prescribing a controlled substance to a patient under the care of hospice, the prescriber shall prescribe an opioid antagonist when any of the following risk factors are present: a history of substance abuse disorder; high dose or cumulative prescriptions that result in over 50 morphine milligram equivalents per day; concurrent use of opioids and benzodiazepine or nonbenzodiazepine sedative hypnotics.
Title
Provides that with the first opioid prescription of each year for use in a setting other than a general hospital or nursing home under article twenty-eight of this chapter or facility under article thirty-one of the mental hygiene law, or when a practitioner is prescribing a controlled substance to a patient under the care of hospice, the prescriber shall prescribe an opioid antagonist when any of the following risk factors are present: a history of substance abuse disorder; high dose or cumulative prescriptions that result in over 50 morphine milligram equivalents per day; concurrent use of opioids and benzodiazepine or nonbenzodiazepine sedative hypnotics.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | print number 5603b |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | print number 5603a |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2019-02-13 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S05150 (Same As) 2020-02-04 - referred to ways and means