NY A05607 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - advanced to third reading cal.249
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits contracts for the purchase or lease of consumer goods from restricting venue in an action relating to such contract.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits contracts for the purchase or lease of consumer goods from restricting venue in an action relating to such contract.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.249
2019-04-30Assemblyreported
2019-04-08Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-02-14Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S00429 (Same As) 2019-02-04 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback