NY A05611 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.213
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.213
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes the affirmative allegation provisions for high-cost loans and subprime home loans, applicable to all mortgage foreclosures.
Title
Makes the affirmative allegation provisions for high-cost loans and subprime home loans, applicable to all mortgage foreclosures.
Sponsors
Asm. Helene Weinstein [D] | Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D] | Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] | Asm. Alfred Taylor [D] |
Asm. Tremaine Wright [D] | Asm. Latrice Walker [D] | Asm. Walter Mosley [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.213 |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.419 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S03216 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES