NY A05615 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - signed chap.167
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - signed chap.167
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the regulation of distressed home loans.
Title
Provides for the regulation of distressed home loans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-14 | Senate | signed chap.167 |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-04-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-01 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.302 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1688 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.119 |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S01688 (Same As) 2019-08-14 - signed chap.167