NY A05616 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - advanced to third reading cal.197
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a cause of action by residents of adult facilities to petition for the appointment of a temporary operator of any such facility in violation of the provisions of law, rules and regulations applicable thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a cause of action by residents of adult facilities to petition for the appointment of a temporary operator of any such facility in violation of the provisions of law, rules and regulations applicable thereto.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.197
2019-04-09Assemblyreported
2019-04-02Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-02-14Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S04486 (Same As) 2019-03-13 - REFERRED TO HEALTH

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback