NY A05618 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-1)
Status: Passed on August 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-20 - SIGNED CHAP.176
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-1)
Status: Passed on August 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-20 - SIGNED CHAP.176
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defines "victim of domestic violence"; prohibits employers from discriminating against victims of domestic violence.
Title
Defines "victim of domestic violence"; prohibits employers from discriminating against victims of domestic violence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.176 |
2019-08-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-14 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-05-14 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-14 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.300 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | substituted for a5618 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.675 |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-10 | Assembly | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | substituted by s1040 |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.300 |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S01040 (Same As) 2019-08-20 - SIGNED CHAP.176