NY A05619 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-23 - SIGNED CHAP.739
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-23 - SIGNED CHAP.739
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the defense, in a mortgage foreclosure action, of the plaintiff's lack of standing is not waived because of the defendant's failure to raise such defense in his or her responsive pleading.
Title
Provides that the defense, in a mortgage foreclosure action, of the plaintiff's lack of standing is not waived because of the defendant's failure to raise such defense in his or her responsive pleading.
Sponsors
Asm. Helene Weinstein [D] | Asm. Nick Perry [D] | Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] |
Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] | Asm. Alfred Taylor [D] | Asm. Tremaine Wright [D] | Asm. Latrice Walker [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.739 |
2019-12-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.250 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a5619 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | referred to judiciary |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.646 |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s5160 |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.250 |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S05160 (Same As) 2019-12-23 - SIGNED CHAP.739