NY A05629 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a liability insurer may be sued for and the plaintiff may recover compensatory damages where the insurer failed to effectuate prompt and fair settlement of the claim and considered its interests to the detriment of the insured so as to cause the rendering of a judgment in excess of the policy limits.
Title
Provides that a liability insurer may be sued for and the plaintiff may recover compensatory damages where the insurer failed to effectuate prompt and fair settlement of the claim and considered its interests to the detriment of the insured so as to cause the rendering of a judgment in excess of the policy limits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 5629b |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | print number 5629a |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S03634 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE