NY A05630 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Reforms the statutory short form and other powers of attorney for purposes of financial and estate planning.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reforms the statutory short form and other powers of attorney for purposes of financial and estate planning.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 100 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-13Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.269
2019-06-13Assemblyrules report cal.269
2019-06-13Assemblyreported
2019-06-11Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-04Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-02-14Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S03923 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05630&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05630&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05630
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05630&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05630&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05630&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05630&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback