NY A05633 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - print number 5633b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - print number 5633b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the adjustment of the minimum amount of tax delinquency for which the driver's license of a taxpayer may be suspended, based on inflation; prohibits inclusion in the license suspension program of a taxpayer who receives public assistance or supplemental security income, or whose income does not exceed 250% of the poverty level; authorizes the commissioner to grant exemptions to taxpayers whose payment of past due tax liabilities would create a hardship to the taxpayer in meeting necessary living expenses.
Title
Provides for the adjustment of the minimum amount of tax delinquency for which the driver's license of a taxpayer may be suspended, based on inflation; prohibits inclusion in the license suspension program of a taxpayer who receives public assistance or supplemental security income, or whose income does not exceed 250% of the poverty level; authorizes the commissioner to grant exemptions to taxpayers whose payment of past due tax liabilities would create a hardship to the taxpayer in meeting necessary living expenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | Assembly | print number 5633b |
2020-01-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | print number 5633a |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S03836 (Same As) 2020-07-22 - referred to ways and means