NY A05635 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-25 - SIGNED CHAP.117
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-25 - SIGNED CHAP.117
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to notification of a security breach; includes credit and debit cards; increases civil penalties.
Title
Relates to notification of a security breach; includes credit and debit cards; increases civil penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.117 |
2019-07-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.135 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a5635b |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5575B |
2019-06-13 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-13 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-05 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.1094 |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 5575A |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s5575b |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | amended on third reading 5635b |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.135 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.135 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | print number 5635a |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S00133 (Same As) 2019-05-06 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S05575 (Same As) 2019-07-25 - SIGNED CHAP.117
S05575 (Same As) 2019-07-25 - SIGNED CHAP.117