NY A05660 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-9)
Status: Passed on November 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-11 - APPROVAL MEMO.17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-9)
Status: Passed on November 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-11 - APPROVAL MEMO.17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the performance of a study regarding homeless persons who are veterans in the state of New York.
Title
Relates to the performance of a study regarding homeless persons who are veterans in the state of New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-11 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.17 |
2019-11-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.487 |
2019-11-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-01 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-05-01 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-01 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.199 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | substituted for a5660 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 4049A |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-13 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.274 |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | substituted by s4049a |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.199 |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | reported |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S04049 (Same As) 2019-11-11 - APPROVAL MEMO.17