NY A05661 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Passed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - signed chap.513
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Passed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - signed chap.513
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the definition of, and information provided about, sex offenders.
Title
Relates to the definition of, and information provided about, sex offenders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-23 | Senate | signed chap.513 |
2011-09-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2011-06-15 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-15 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1269 |
2011-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1521 |
2011-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2011-06-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-05-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.465 |
2011-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2011-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2011-02-24 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S01521 (Same As) 2011-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5661