NY A05701 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - signed chap.101
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - signed chap.101
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system in Oneida county as the "Officer Kevin F. Crossley Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system in Oneida county as the "Officer Kevin F. Crossley Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-16 | Senate | signed chap.101 |
2019-07-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-07 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-07 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.234 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3220B |
2019-05-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.251 |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | print number 5701b |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | print number 5701a |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S03220 (Same As) 2019-07-16 - signed chap.101