NY A05716 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-15 - advanced to third reading cal.687
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-15 - advanced to third reading cal.687
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to automatic renewals of magazine subscriptions; requires certain notice and protections.
Title
Relates to automatic renewals of magazine subscriptions; requires certain notice and protections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.687 |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | reported |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2013-05-22 | Assembly | print number 5716c |
2013-05-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2013-05-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | print number 5716b |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | print number 5716a |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2013-03-06 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S02076 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION