NY A05731 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-16 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-16 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a unicameral legislature consisting of seventy-five senators called the senate; eliminates the state assembly while enlarging the size of the state senate to 75 members; makes necessary conforming changes to the legislative and redistricting processes, the powers and duties of the legislature, the veto override process, and certain appointments as needed to reflect the establishment of a unicameral legislative body.
Title
Creates a unicameral legislature consisting of seventy-five senators called the senate; eliminates the state assembly while enlarging the size of the state senate to 75 members; makes necessary conforming changes to the legislative and redistricting processes, the powers and duties of the legislature, the veto override process, and certain appointments as needed to reflect the establishment of a unicameral legislative body.
Sponsors
Asm. Mark Johns [R] | Asm. Karl Brabenec [R] | Asm. Kevin Byrne [R] | Asm. John Salka [R] |
Asm. Joseph DeStefano [R] | Asm. David DiPietro [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-16 | Assembly | held for consideration in governmental operations |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |