NY A05732 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals paragraph (e) of subdivision 4 of section 209 of the civil service law relating to providing for limitations on binding arbitration for members of the state police.
Title
Repeals paragraph (e) of subdivision 4 of section 209 of the civil service law relating to providing for limitations on binding arbitration for members of the state police.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2011-03-28 | Assembly | starred on calendar |
2011-03-24 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.152 |
2011-03-22 | Assembly | reported |
2011-02-28 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |