NY A05757 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-30 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-30 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides protection to employees and former employees from retaliatory actions by employers for the reporting of illegal business activities.
Title
Provides protection to employees and former employees from retaliatory actions by employers for the reporting of illegal business activities.
Sponsors
Asm. Michael Benedetto [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] | Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Asm. Phillip Steck [D] |
Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 110 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.406 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.111 |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.111 |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S01887 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO LABOR