NY A05764 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.269
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.269
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes technical corrections to certain shellfish regulations.
Title
Makes technical corrections to certain shellfish regulations.
Sponsors
Asm. Jaime Williams [D] | Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D] | Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] | Asm. Michael Miller [D] |
Asm. Brian Miller [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Senate | signed chap.269 |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1453 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6363 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.523 |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S06363 (Same As) 2019-09-13 - signed chap.269