NY A05774 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that every motor carrier shall furnish the department of motor vehicles a list of each altered motor vehicle commonly referred to as a "stretch limousine" designed to carry 15 or more passengers; requires the commissioner of motor vehicles to annually review the bus driver files of each driver employed by a motor vehicle carrier who operates such stretch limousine; makes related provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that every motor carrier shall furnish the department of motor vehicles a list of each altered motor vehicle commonly referred to as a "stretch limousine" designed to carry 15 or more passengers; requires the commissioner of motor vehicles to annually review the bus driver files of each driver employed by a motor vehicle carrier who operates such stretch limousine; makes related provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-18Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-13Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.271
2019-06-13Assemblyrules report cal.271
2019-06-13Assemblyreported
2019-06-11Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-05Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-05-31Assemblyprint number 5774a
2019-05-31Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to transportation
2019-02-19Assemblyreferred to transportation

Same As/Similar To

S06604 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - REFERRED TO RULES

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05774&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05774&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05774
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05774&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05774A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05774&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05774&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05774&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05774&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback