NY A05785 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes registration as an organ donor in the donate life registry on SUNY, CUNY and library card applications.
Title
Authorizes registration as an organ donor in the donate life registry on SUNY, CUNY and library card applications.
Sponsors
Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] | Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] | Asm. Monica Wallace [D] |
Asm. Inez Dickens [D] | Asm. Walter Mosley [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | print number 5785a |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S01491 (Same As) 2020-08-11 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN