NY A05796 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-16 - held for consideration in real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-16 - held for consideration in real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the payment of state aid to the town of Ashford, in the county of Cattaraugus, for state lands in such town.
Title
Provides for the payment of state aid to the town of Ashford, in the county of Cattaraugus, for state lands in such town.
Sponsors
Asm. Joseph Giglio [R] | Asm. Joseph DeStefano [R] | Asm. Brian Miller [R] | Asm. Peter Lawrence [R] |
Asm. Angelo Morinello [R] | Asm. David McDonough [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-16 | Assembly | held for consideration in real property taxation |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S00962 (Same As) 2019-01-09 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
S07217 (Same As) 2020-01-10 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
S07217 (Same As) 2020-01-10 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS