NY A05806 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s3955
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s3955
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the expiration of the authorization to the county of Wyoming to impose an additional one percent sales and compensating use tax.
Title
Extends the expiration of the authorization to the county of Wyoming to impose an additional one percent sales and compensating use tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s3955 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.536 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.536 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-03-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S03955 (Same As) 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.293