NY A05819 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.231
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.231
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to automobile tire inflation machines; vests jurisdiction over automobile tire inflation machines with the state.
Title
Relates to automobile tire inflation machines; vests jurisdiction over automobile tire inflation machines with the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.231 |
2020-09-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.162 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | substituted for a5819a |
2020-02-26 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2020-02-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.270 |
2020-01-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4495A |
2020-01-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO AGRICULTURE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Senate | died in assembly |
2019-06-05 | Senate | referred to agriculture |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.911 |
2019-03-13 | Assembly | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | substituted by s4495a |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.162 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-02-19 | Assembly | print number 5819a |
2020-02-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to agriculture |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S04495 (Same As) 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.231