NY A05820 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.263
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.263
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing accidental disability retirement benefits for chief fire marshals, assistant chief fire marshals, division supervising fire marshals, supervising fire marshals, fire marshals and fire marshal trainees in Nassau county.
Title
Relates to providing accidental disability retirement benefits for chief fire marshals, assistant chief fire marshals, division supervising fire marshals, supervising fire marshals, fire marshals and fire marshal trainees in Nassau county.
Sponsors
Asm. Peter Abbate [D] | Asm. Michaelle Solages [D] | Asm. Judy Griffin [D] | Asm. Michael LiPetri [R] |
Asm. Andrew Garbarino [R] | Asm. Michael Montesano [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Civil Service And Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Civil Service And Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.263 |
2019-12-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | home rule request |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.357 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a5820 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | referred to governmental employees |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1300 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s3813 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.357 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.357 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S03813 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.263