NY A05821 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.696
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.696
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the employer's ability to suspend a police officer without pay pending disciplinary charges.
Title
Relates to the employer's ability to suspend a police officer without pay pending disciplinary charges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | signed chap.696 |
2019-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1767 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4083A |
2019-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.139 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.139 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 5821a |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S04083 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - signed chap.696